Carnival PLC Director Resignation; New Board Committee Appointments
January 28 2020 - 11:56AM
UK Regulatory
TIDMCCL
RESIGNATION OF DIRECTOR AND NEW BOARD COMMITTEE APPOINMENTS
MIAMI (January 28, 2020) - Carnival Corporation & plc (NYSE/LSE: CCL; NYSE:
CUK) announce that on January 27, 2020, Debra Kelly-Ennis resigned from her
position as a Director of Carnival Corporation and Carnival plc, including her
role as a member of their Health, Environmental, Safety and Security ("HESS")
Committees, effective that same day. The Boards thank Debra for her years of
dedication and service.
In addition, on January 27, 2020, the Boards approved the following changes to
the composition of the Audit, Compensation and HESS Committees effective
February 1, 2020: (1) Helen Deeble will join the Compensation Committees; and
(2) Katie Lahey will step down from the Audit Committees and join the HESS
Committees.
END
(END) Dow Jones Newswires
January 28, 2020 11:56 ET (16:56 GMT)
Carnival (LSE:CCL)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Carnival (LSE:CCL)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024