Ashley (Laura) Hldgs PLC Retirement of Directors (2176O)
August 04 2014 - 12:00PM
UK Regulatory
TIDMALY
RNS Number : 2176O
Ashley (Laura) Hldgs PLC
04 August 2014
4 August 2014
Laura Ashley Holdings plc (the "Company")
Retirement of Directors
The Board of the Company today announces that Ms Ho Kuan Lai,
Non-Executive Director of the Company, has resigned from the Board
effective 3 August 2014. Ms Frances Boon Wah Ling, Alternate
Director to Ms Ho Kuan Lai, has also ceased to hold the office as
the Alternate Director. The Board would like to take this
opportunity to thank Ms Ho and Ms Boon for the contribution that
they have made during their tenure with the Company and to wish
them well in their future.
Enquiries:
Seán Anglim Laura Ashley 020 7880 5100
Anita Scott/James Olley Brunswick 020 7404 5959
Mark Percy/Catherine Leftley
(Corporate Finance) Cantor Fitzgerald Europe 020 7894 7000
Richard Redmayne (Corporate Broking)
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOASSDFILFLSELA
Ashley (laura) (LSE:ALY)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Ashley (laura) (LSE:ALY)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024