AVEVA Group PLC Director Declaration (4783K)
July 07 2017 - 8:04AM
UK Regulatory
TIDMAVV
RNS Number : 4783K
AVEVA Group PLC
07 July 2017
AVEVA Group plc ("the Company")
Retirement of Philip Dayer
Following the Company's Annual General Meeting held at 9.30 a.m.
today, Friday 7 July 2017, and as previously announced in the
Company's Annual Report, Philip Dayer has retired as a Director of
the Company with immediate effect. Save for fees receivable in
respect of his services up to today, no payments are being made to
Mr Dayer which are required to be disclosed under s430(2B)
Companies Act 2006.
During his time with the Company, Philip has acted as both
Senior Independent Director and Chair of the Remuneration
Committee.
The Company would like to take this opportunity to thank Phillip
for his service and contribution to the Company and the Board.
Christopher Humphrey, Non Executive Director, will take over as
Senior Independent Director of AVEVA's Board with immediate
effect.
Jennifer Allerton, Non Executive Director, will now replace
Philip Dayer as the Chairperson of the Remuneration Committee with
immediate effect.
Enquires: Telephone:
----------------------------- -------------------
AVEVA Group plc
----------------------------- -------------------
David Ward, Chief Financial
Officer +44 (0)1223 556655
----------------------------- -------------------
Claire Denton, Company
Secretary +44 (0)1223 556655
----------------------------- -------------------
FTI Consulting Telephone:
-------------------------- --------------------
Ed Bridges/Dwight Burden +44 (0)20 3727 1400
-------------------------- --------------------
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
RDNLDLFBDDFBBBX
(END) Dow Jones Newswires
July 07, 2017 08:04 ET (12:04 GMT)
Aveva (LSE:AVV)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
Aveva (LSE:AVV)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024