Current Report Filing (8-k)
June 16 2014 - 4:41PM
Edgar (US Regulatory)
UNITED
STATES
SECURITIES
AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington,
D.C. 20549
FORM
8-K
CURRENT
REPORT
Pursuant
to Section 13 or 15(d) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date
of report (date of earliest event reported): June 11, 2014
VERITY
CORP.
(Exact
name of registrant as specified in its charter)
Nevada |
|
333-147367 |
|
38-3767357 |
(State
or Other Jurisdiction
of
Incorporation) |
|
(Commission
File
Number) |
|
(IRS
Employer
Identification
No.) |
47184
258th Street, Sioux Falls, SD 57107
(Address
of principal executive offices)
Registrant’s
telephone number, including area code: (360) 473-1160
Copy
of correspondence to:
Marc
J. Ross, Esq.
Thomas
A. Rose, Esq.
Sichenzia
Ross Friedman Ference LLP
61
Broadway
New
York, New York 10006
Tel:
(212) 930-9700 Fax: (212) 930-9725
Check
the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant
under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
[ ] Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
[ ] Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
[ ] Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
[ ] Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Item
3.02 Unregistered Sales of Equity Securities.
On
June 10, 2014, Verity Corp. (the “Company”), granted an aggregate of 6,350,000 shares of common stock to be issued
to certain officer, directors, employees and other providing services to the Company, in consideration of such services. Of such
amount, 1,000,000 will be granted to our Chief Operating Officer, James White, for services in 2015. Such shares were granted
pursuant to the exemption provided under Section 4(a)(2) of the Securities Act of 1933.
Item
5.02 Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory
Arrangements of Certain Officers.
Appointment
Ronald Kaufman as President
Effective
June 10, 2014, the Company appointed Ronald Kaufman as President.
Mr.
Kaufman, age 57, has been a member of the Company’s Board of Directors since October 21, 2013. Mr. Kaufman has been a professional
crop and live-stock farmer since 1976. Mr. Kaufman has served on the boards of Farmers Home Association and the Kingsbury County
Crop Improvement Board.
There
is no understanding or arrangement between Mr. Kaufman and any other person pursuant to which Mr. Kaufman was selected as an officer.
Mr. Kaufman does not have any family relationship with any director, executive officer or person nominated or chosen by us to
become a director or executive officer, except that he is the nephew of Duane Spader, a member of the Board of Directors.
Appointment
of James White as a Member of the Board of Directors
On
June 10, 2014, the Company appointed James White, age 62, as a member of the Company’s Board of Directors. Mr. White has
been Chief Operating Officer of the Company since November 2013. In 2004, Mr. Wright founded JLW Communications, a consulting
company for sales, marketing and strategic management, including five years of consulting work for the Company. Mr. Wright previously
served as president of Triumph Boats, president of McCulloch Corporation and vice president of Deere & Company.
There
is no understanding or arrangement between Mr. White and any other person pursuant to which Mr. White was selected as an officer.
Mr. White does not have any family relationship with any director, executive officer or person nominated or chosen by us to become
a director or executive officer.
Appointment
of Richard Kamolvathin as Chairman of the Board and Resignation as President of the Company
On
June 10, 2014, Richard Kamolvathin was appointed as Chairman of the Board of Directors of the Company. On the same date he also
resigned as President of the Company. Mr. Kamolvathin will continue to serve as Chief Executive Officer and a member of the Board
of Directors of the Company. In submitting his resignation, Mr. Kamolvathin did not express any disagreement with the Company
on any matter relating to the Company’s operations, policies or practices.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant
to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf
by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
|
VERITY
CORP. |
|
|
|
Dated:
June 16, 2014 |
By:
|
/s/
RICHARD KAMOLVATHIN |
|
|
Richard
Kamolvathin |
|
|
Chief Executive
Officer |