National Grid PLC Director Responsibilities (1296J)
April 01 2015 - 11:00AM
UK Regulatory
TIDMNG.
RNS Number : 1296J
National Grid PLC
01 April 2015
1 April 2015
National Grid plc
Director Responsibilities
As previously announced by the Company on 23 October 2014, Tom
King stepped down from the Board of National Grid on 31 March
2015.
Following Dean Seavers' appointment to the Board as Executive
Director US, he has also become a member of the Executive Committee
of National Grid with effect from 1 April 2015.
Contact:
Alice Morgan, Assistant Company Secretary (+44 20 7004 3228)
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOAPKDDQOBKKAQK
National Grid (LSE:NG.)
Historical Stock Chart
From Aug 2024 to Sep 2024
National Grid (LSE:NG.)
Historical Stock Chart
From Sep 2023 to Sep 2024